Accounts and annual returns UDAY RURAL EDUCATION PROGRAM

Charity number: 1157208
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 February 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 February 2023 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 24 February 2023 116 days late
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 January 2021 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 January 2021 65 days late