Accounts and annual returns OLDHAM WORK CLUB NETWORK

Charity number: 1157060
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2016 19 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2016 19 June 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 28 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 31 January 2016 On Time