Financial history FALLEN ANGELS DANCE THEATRE NORTH WEST

Charity number: 1158251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £155.42k £118.23k £337.19k £139.82k £236.93k
Total expenditure £75.75k £102.43k £259.84k £191.17k £236.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.60k £26.36k £500 £1.02k £14.19k