Trustees STOWMARKET URC CHARITY
Charity number: 1157857

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Robert Sheard | Chair | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Hewitt | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Gosling | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Farmer | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Monika Sudirgo | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Baxter | Trustee | 26 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lois Muller | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith Scarff | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MAUREEN SCARFF B.SC | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILLIAM WEBB | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANET MARY WEBB | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARY DURRANT | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANE HILARY GURNEY | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
HELEN DEBORAH FREEMAN | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.