Financial history FRIENDS OF MADELEY HIGH SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1157326
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/11/2019 01/11/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £5.26k £552 £640 £1.06k £1.01k
Total expenditure £1.54k £122 £123 £7.70k £140
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A