Financial history GOING TO A GOOD HOME

Charity Number: 1158393
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £21.50k £22.25k £23.34k £22.77k £22.85k
Total expenditure £20.76k £21.20k £22.99k £22.34k £22.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A