Trustees THE NAILSWORTH YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ENTERPRISE
Charity number: 1161113

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN LEE DUCKWORTH | Chair | 25 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Luke Alexander Stewart | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clifford John Jordan | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Zoe Peregrina Weston | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Parker | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark John Peer | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Shipp | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Pam Brown | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Iain McIvor | Trustee | 02 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
FERN FRANCES BRATBY | Trustee | 19 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
FREDERICK ROBERT ASHWORTH | Trustee | 19 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS LESLIE HAINES MBE | Trustee | 19 November 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.