Accounts and annual returns TEAZLE WOOD TRUST

Charity number: 1160532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 August 2023 02 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 August 2023 02 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 August 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 August 2022 31 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 August 2021 05 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 August 2021 05 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 August 2020 04 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 August 2020 04 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 August 2019 04 June 2021 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 August 2019 04 June 2021 364 days late Download Open in new window