Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS BLUNDELLSANDS
Charity number: 1158819

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Blundell | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Phillips | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Warren | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Pennington | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek John Parkinson | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Elizabeth Anne Anderson | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN ENSTONE | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANN SINKER | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN FRANK GREEN | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR PETER WILLIAM JAMES BATEY | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Glenda Grace Cain | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Doyle | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Anne Utley | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MARJORIE DOBIE BA HONS | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.