Trustees SEAFORD DOWN'S SYNDROME AND SPECIAL NEEDS SUPPORT GROUP
Charity number: 1158693

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALI WOODMAN | Chair | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Louise Anastasia Frogley | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Shepherd | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Tant | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Buroni | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Prior | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Evans | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Brown | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Colin Morrison | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.