Financial history BRIDGEND AND DISTRICT BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1159663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £36.38k £28.77k £9.01k £9.02k £15.19k
Total expenditure £25.37k £17.05k £9.35k £11.89k £13.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A