Financial history DOORSTEP LIBRARY NETWORK

Charity number: 1158197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £454.57k £741.84k £640.60k £828.49k £902.63k
Total expenditure £413.31k £462.75k £741.37k £875.49k £692.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £32.00k £32.00k £32.00k £39.34k £41.20k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £709.84k £608.60k £793.75k £868.24k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £32.00k £32.00k £34.74k £33.60k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £788
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £379.75k £631.90k £738.25k £569.70k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £83.00k £109.47k £137.24k £122.82k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £5.01k £8.92k £29.17k £27.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0