Financial history THE HULL WOMENS AID GROUP

Charity number: 504903
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £557.03k £541.25k £645.29k £619.29k £593.46k
Total expenditure £511.47k £510.17k £552.12k £571.11k £555.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £321.62k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £96.34k
Income - Donations and legacies £316.73k £10.38k £10.21k £40.87k £7.92k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £239.10k £529.50k £633.09k £572.43k £580.04k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.21k £1.37k £1.99k £2.27k £5.51k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £3.72k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £496.14k £503.42k £545.52k £565.87k £543.96k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £15.33k £6.75k £6.60k £5.24k £11.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0