Accounts and annual returns WAT BUDDHARAM LEEDS

Charity number: 1158536
Charity reporting is up to date (60 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 30 July 2024 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 30 July 2024 60 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 07 August 2023 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 07 August 2023 68 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 July 2022 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 30 July 2022 60 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 30 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 30 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 31 July 2020 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 31 July 2020 61 days late Download Open in new window