Accounts and annual returns OUR UMMAH TRUST

Charity number: 1161270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 March 2024 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 March 2024 58 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 March 2023 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 March 2023 53 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 March 2023 418 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 March 2023 418 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 March 2023 783 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 March 2023 783 days late Download Open in new window