Financial history BRIDGEND TOWN JUNIORS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1158594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.65k £3.03k £18.26k £29.06k £48.03k
Total expenditure £20.05k £9.42k £19.66k £32.11k £46.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.00k N/A N/A £7.71k