Trustees PAGANAID

Charity number: 1158075
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Arthur Watt Chair 15 September 2024
None on record
Rebecca North Trustee 23 September 2024
None on record
Alexia Costadina Katsaitis Trustee 10 December 2023
None on record
Pauline Claire Pitchford Trustee 23 August 2023
None on record
Sif Athena Nicole Laura Brookes Trustee 14 August 2023
None on record
Helen Brewin Trustee 11 August 2023
None on record
Suzanne Joan Dymond-White Trustee 25 October 2022
THE PRISON PHOENIX TRUST CIO
Received: On time
Paul Pearson Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record