Accounts and annual returns EDEN LIFELINE PROJECT

Charity number: 1158217
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 November 2020 23 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 November 2020 23 January 2021 On Time
Annual return 03 November 2019 21 January 2021 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 November 2019 21 January 2021 140 days late
Annual return 03 November 2018 24 January 2020 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 November 2018 24 January 2020 143 days late
Annual return 03 November 2017 24 July 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 November 2017 24 July 2018 On Time