Financial history PENCOMBE AND LITTLE COWARNE PARISH HALL

Charity Number: 505000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.54k £21.13k £18.50k £13.24k £16.92k
Total expenditure £21.23k £11.13k £22.81k £15.18k £15.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.23k £10.67k N/A N/A