Accounts and annual returns MAIDSTONE GRAMMAR SCHOOL DEVELOPMENT FUND

Charity Number: 1158329
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 April 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 08 April 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 May 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 23 May 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2016 08 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 08 June 2017 On Time