Accounts and annual returns HOWL

Charity number: 1159159
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 07 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 07 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 20 August 2024 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 20 August 2024 142 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 10 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 10 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 24 May 2022 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 24 May 2022 54 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 31 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 31 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window