Accounts and annual returns SURGICAL RESEARCH GATEWAY FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1159898

Charity reporting is up to date (108 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 20 May 2025 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 20 May 2025 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 20 May 2025 | 474 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 20 May 2025 | 474 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 20 May 2025 | 839 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 20 May 2025 | 839 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 19 May 2025 | 1203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 19 May 2025 | 1203 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window