Financial history THE LEEWOOD GOSPEL HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1159093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £40.88k £73.63k £75.24k £61.17k £75.64k
Total expenditure £44.07k £37.36k £25.57k £55.08k £53.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A