Financial history BROOKFIELD GOSPEL HALL TRUST

Charity Number: 1159421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £102.18k £361.56k £105.84k £132.99k £129.07k
Total expenditure £87.90k £80.75k £96.69k £188.07k £340.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A