Accounts and annual returns INSIDE OUT

Charity number: 1158231
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 17 January 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 22 March 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 22 March 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2014 02 February 2016 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 02 February 2016 94 days late