Accounts and annual returns DOLAFON GOSPEL HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1159103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 20 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 20 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 17 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 13 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 13 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 16 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 16 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window