Financial history CANOLFAN CLYDAU

Charity number: 1158731
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.85k £37.79k £4.29k £24.04k £23.69k
Total expenditure £7.99k £11.47k £17.82k £21.27k £38.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £23.00k N/A £4.85k £9.00k