Financial history KINVER SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 505161
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.85k £7.95k £19.36k £11.49k £12.71k
Total expenditure £19.30k £7.90k £10.36k £11.23k £11.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A