Trustees THE ISAAC NASH TRUST
Charity number: 1160529

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Ainley | Chair | 07 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ADAM PAUL NASH | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN PETER JEFFERSON | Trustee | 02 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sally Byrne | Trustee | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Sykes | Trustee | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD LEWIS | Trustee | 17 September 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.