Financial history ASHBY BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1159600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £131.01k £122.23k £108.38k £118.75k £233.25k
Total expenditure £134.71k £114.71k £109.93k £102.53k £69.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.00k £699