Financial history THE SMILE OF ARRAN TRUST

Charity Number: 1161262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/05/2020 01/05/2021 01/05/2022 01/05/2023 01/05/2024
Total gross income £25.33k £17.32k £11.16k £12.72k £10.89k
Total expenditure £31.54k £16.95k £16.95k £10.22k £9.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A