Financial history WORLDWIDE CHURCH OF THE POWER OF GOD

Charity number: 1159432
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 09/12/2015 09/12/2016 09/12/2017 09/12/2018 09/12/2019
Total gross income £4.56k £23.61k £124.63k £38.10k £54.66k
Total expenditure £4.43k £24.72k £94.82k £64.34k £53.55k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A