Accounts and annual returns LIMB FUTURE

Charity number: 1159729
Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 04 April 2023 10 November 2024 280 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2023 10 November 2024 280 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2022 10 November 2024 645 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2022 10 November 2024 645 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2021 10 November 2024 1010 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 10 November 2024 1010 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2020 08 May 2021 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 08 May 2021 93 days late Download Open in new window