Financial history DUNDONALD MUSICAL TRUST

Charity Number: 1160016
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £674 £0 £0 £0 £1.13k
Total expenditure £1.42k £284 £680 £1.35k £1.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A