Financial history ST DAVIDS LODGE NO 2226 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 505278
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £779 £1.65k £1.64k £990 £1.19k
Total expenditure £1.00k £1.15k £1.15k £1.10k £395
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A