Accounts and annual returns FIRE PROMOTION MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1159869
Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2023 03 August 2024 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2023 03 August 2024 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2022 16 November 2023 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2022 16 November 2023 139 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2021 16 July 2023 381 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2021 16 July 2023 381 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2020 20 March 2022 263 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2020 20 March 2022 263 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2019 24 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2019 24 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window