Financial history GROVE PARK THEATRE

Charity number: 505339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £107.41k £129.66k £35.15k £24.11k £110.80k
Total expenditure £98.11k £84.91k £32.07k £46.51k £77.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £35.00k £25.00k £6.00k N/A