Financial history WEIDENFELD-HOFFMANN TRUST

Charity Number: 1158918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.08m £698.91k £1.19m £1.72m £553.33k
Total expenditure £655.94k £491.25k £616.71k £811.77k £716.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.08m £698.89k £1.19m £1.69m £521.81k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £20.00k £0 £0 £27.38k
Income - Investment £487 £21 £6.41k £32.04k £31.52k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £655.94k £436.25k £616.71k £811.77k £715.83k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £55.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £306.71k £19.85k £65.96k £24.81k £26.15k
Expenditure - Grants institution £269.38k £0 £166.04k £0 £139.73k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £240