Accounts and annual returns CWMAFAN BOWLS CLUB

Charity number: 1161617
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 01 February 2025 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 01 February 2025 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 May 2024 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 27 May 2024 117 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 February 2023 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 March 2023 45 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window