Financial history HEART OF GISSING

Charity number: 1161599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £43.40k £35.47k £24.98k £29.22k £31.42k
Total expenditure £27.51k £24.69k £21.63k £31.24k £22.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £14.00k £18.71k £2.67k N/A N/A