Accounts and annual returns Wessex Pastoral Counselling CIO

Charity number: 1159779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 05 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 June 2024 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 June 2024 144 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 28 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window