Financial history PARKSIDE & DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1162093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £22.69k £40.78k £67.36k £41.10k £73.28k
Total expenditure £31.23k £29.07k £64.38k £57.10k £67.28k
Income from government contracts N/A £2.51k N/A £3.92k £32.40k
Income from government grants £4.95k £10.00k N/A N/A £38.45k