Trustees THE COACH HOUSE THEATRE (MALVERN) LTD
Charity number: 1169603

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenny Wicks | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Jones | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Brockington | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Carl Whittle | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DENHAM | Trustee | 01 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAN GREIG | Trustee | 20 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW HOWIE | Trustee | 17 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.