Accounts and annual returns LITTLE STEPS BIG FUTURES

Charity Number: 1159417
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 February 2025 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 12 February 2025 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 March 2024 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 March 2024 55 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 15 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 March 2022 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 March 2022 51 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 March 2021 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 March 2021 54 days late Download Open in new window