Trustees FRIENDS AND PLACES TOGETHER

Charity number: 1159584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
paige dabbs Trustee 30 March 2025
None on record
julie jackson Trustee 20 March 2024
None on record
Ian Jones Trustee 05 July 2023
None on record
Christopher Woolard Trustee 30 March 2022
None on record
Wendy Bennet Trustee 05 December 2021
None on record
SATHYENDRAN RAVIRAJ Trustee 02 February 2018
None on record