Accounts and annual returns PROVIDENCE HOUSE YOUTH CLUB

Charity Number: 1159817
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required