Financial history WAUNIFOR YOUTH CLUB LTD

Charity Number: 1161278
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 02/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £60.26k £81.19k £45.01k £7.62k £2.89k
Total expenditure £49.79k £64.93k £53.05k £41.22k £2.86k
Income from government contracts £0 £40.00k £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £56.83k £40.00k £4.90k N/A N/A