Accounts and annual returns THE MARTIN LAWRENCE MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1160425
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 08 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 18 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 18 October 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2016 26 September 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 26 September 2016 On Time