Accounts and annual returns THE ALMSCLIFFE HALL

Charity number: 505587
Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 02 June 2023 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 02 June 2023 117 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 10 March 2022 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 10 March 2022 33 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 26 February 2021 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 26 February 2021 21 days late Download Open in new window