Financial history DARBAR UNIQUE CENTRE - SAINT PIR PANDARIMAN

Charity number: 1160797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.10k £19.17k £37.68k £38.55k £79.91k
Total expenditure £19.70k £18.56k £28.36k £38.55k £74.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A